Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0162 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill March 31, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023