House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/30/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS/CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
CS/CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/20/23, 12:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Environment and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Community Affairs; Environment and Natural Resources; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|