Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0192 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 13, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 21, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023