|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-247
|
|
|
|
06/16/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (876100)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/09/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/14/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|