Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0204 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 10, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 9, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023