Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 301 (Ch. 2023-99)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 301
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/20/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 03/14/23, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 02/07/23, 9:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/17/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|