Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0212 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 19, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023