Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 04/05/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/17/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/18/2023 | Filed |