Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0224 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023