|
06/16/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-213
|
|
|
|
06/12/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
06/05/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (581458)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/30/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/22/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
CS/CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Now in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|