Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0226 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 30, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023
Analysis February 8, 2023
Analysis February 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 8, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023