Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 837 (Ch. 2023-15)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 837
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/16/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by Judiciary (209768); YEAS 8 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Judiciary; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|