Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0236 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 20, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023