|
05/10/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-35
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/08/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 72, NAYS 44
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 613459 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 535379 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 483585 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Amendment 488749 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Substituted for CS/HB 1445
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 2)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/25/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (690590)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Amendment(s) failed (436266)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) failed (586438, 692892, 817316)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (297578)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/23/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/16/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|