Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0256 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 29, 2023
Bill March 23, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 17, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023