|
05/09/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-33, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 645 (Ch. 2023-147)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/08/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment 790990 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 31 NAYS 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (048607)
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2023
|
Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (790990)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 95, NAYS 17
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Amendment 048607 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (415792, 708856)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/22/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 03/14/23, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Referred to Judiciary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|