Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 2, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 6, 2023
Bill April 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 6, 2023

Analysis

Analysis May 3, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 23, 2023
Bill March 15, 2023