|
05/26/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-158
|
|
|
|
05/26/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/1/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/22/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/08/23, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/20/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Now in Health Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2023
|
Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 02/08/23, 9:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2023
|
Referred to Education Postsecondary; Health Policy; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|