Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis February 21, 2023
Analysis February 17, 2023
Analysis February 8, 2023
Analysis February 7, 2023