Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/14/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 02/14/23, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/26/2023 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/19/2023 | Filed |