Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0288 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 19, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis February 14, 2023
Analysis February 13, 2023