Senate | 04/18/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 3 (Ch. 2023-28) | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Substituted CS/CS/HB 3 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/18/23 | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/13/2023 | Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 13 NAYS 6 | ||
Senate | 04/10/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/31/2023 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 03/29/2023 | CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 03/24/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/29/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/03/2023 | Filed |