Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill March 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 30, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 31, 2023