Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7063 (Ch. 2023-157) | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/21/2023 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 03/21/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Transportation; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Transportation, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Transportation; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/23/2023 | Filed |