Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0322 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 23, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023