House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/22/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Now in Banking and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|