Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0356 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023