Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 535 (Ch. 2023-145)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 535
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
CS/CS by Fiscal Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
CS/CS by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 04/04/23, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Now in Criminal Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/07/23, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Criminal Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|