Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0364 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 14, 2023
Bill March 9, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 14, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023