Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/16/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/10/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Referred to Health Policy; Community Affairs; Rules | ||
Senate | 01/25/2023 | Filed |