Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023