House
|
05/05/2023
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/30/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 03/23/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/14/23, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/06/23, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|