Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0382 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 8, 2023