|
05/12/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-44
|
|
|
|
05/11/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/09/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted for CS/CS/HB 273
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (4/27/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment(s) adopted (550788)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/24/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/22/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|