Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0404 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 25, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 11, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 27, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 24, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 21, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023