Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0424 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 26, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 24, 2023
Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 5, 2023