Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 411 (Ch. 2023-101)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted HB 411
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 14 NAYS 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2023
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 9 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 04/04/23, 11:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
Now in Education Pre-K -12
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Favorable by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/07/23, 2:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Ethics and Elections; Education Pre-K -12; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/30/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|