Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0444 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 30, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 21, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 21, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis April 3, 2023
Analysis March 8, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023