Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1133 (Ch. 2023-274)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 1133
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Favorable by Education Postsecondary; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Postsecondary, 04/05/23, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Now in Education Postsecondary
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Health Policy; Education Postsecondary; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|