Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0454 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 31, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis April 5, 2023
Analysis April 4, 2023
Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 29, 2023