|
06/01/2023
|
Chapter No. 2023-168
|
|
|
|
05/30/2023
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/16/2023
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2023
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2023
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (5/2/2023)
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/11/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/23, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Education read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
CS by Appropriations Committee on Education; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Education, 03/14/23, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Appropriations Committee on Education; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|