Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0478 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 4, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 29, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 7, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 15, 2023