Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 431 (Ch. 2023-123)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 431
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/28/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Favorable by- Fiscal Policy; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Fiscal Policy, 04/13/23, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
Now in Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 03/21/23, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
Now in Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
CS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/13/23, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2023
|
Referred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|