Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0486 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 2, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 13, 2023
Analysis April 12, 2023
Analysis March 22, 2023
Analysis March 20, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023
Analysis March 10, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill March 14, 2023