Senate | 05/05/2023 | Died in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 14 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 03/14/23, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Now in Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 03/06/2023 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 03/06/23, 1:00 pm, 301 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Committee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Filed |