Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0506 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023
Analysis March 6, 2023
Analysis March 3, 2023