Senate | 05/02/2023 | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 795 (Ch. 2023-281) | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Substituted HB 795 | ||
Senate | 05/02/2023 | Read 2nd time | ||
Senate | 04/27/2023 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 05/02/23 | ||
Senate | 04/20/2023 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | ||
Senate | 04/19/2023 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 04/14/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/19/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/28/2023 | Now in Rules | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Favorable by Health Policy; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/22/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/15/2023 | Now in Health Policy | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Favorable by Education Pre-K -12; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 03/09/2023 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K -12, 03/14/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 03/07/2023 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 02/16/2023 | Referred to Education Pre-K -12; Health Policy; Rules | ||
Senate | 02/03/2023 | Filed |