Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0514 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 3, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 20, 2023
Analysis April 18, 2023
Analysis March 27, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 15, 2023
Analysis March 13, 2023