Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 607 (Ch. 2023-125)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Substituted CS/HB 607
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/26/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2023
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/19/23
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 04/11/23, 8:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/27/2023
|
Favorable by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 03/27/23, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Now in Commerce and Tourism
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/17/2023
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2023
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 12 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2023
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 03/15/23, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2023
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2023
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Commerce and Tourism; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Filed
|
|
|