Florida 2023 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S0532 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 6, 2023

Comm Sub

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill March 17, 2023

Analysis

Analysis April 11, 2023
Analysis April 10, 2023
Analysis March 28, 2023
Analysis March 24, 2023
Analysis March 17, 2023
Analysis March 14, 2023